HI SR30 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 15 Through April 22, 2018, As Volunteer Week In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing April 15 Through April 22, 2018, As Volunteer Week In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:35AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR30 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR99 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR99 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.