HI SR43 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Review Of The State's Funding For Existing English As A Second Language Instruction And Activities And Hawaiian Language Programs Offered In Hawaii And Any Disparities In Funding For The State's Two Official Languages.
Title
Review; ESL; Hawaiian Language Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3417) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from HWN/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3058), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Kahele, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HWN/EDU, WAM. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Offered. |