HI SR61 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR61
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education To Restrict Any Person From Applying For The Position Of Superintendent Of Education If That Person Was A Member Of The Board Of Education When The Search And Hiring Process Was Developed Or Initiated.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education To Restrict Any Person From Applying For The Position Of Superintendent Of Education If That Person Was A Member Of The Board Of Education When The Search And Hiring Process Was Developed Or Initiated.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR61 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR105 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 30
HR105 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=61&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR61_.HTM |