HI SR7 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Name The New Central Oahu Ambulance Facility After The Late Loretta Fuddy, Director Of Health.
Title
Central Oahu Ambulance Facility; Loretta Fuddy
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3185) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to TEC. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3089), with recommendation of referral to TEC. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, TEC. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR8 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 9
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=7&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SR7_.HTM |