HI SR7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR7
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-19. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1653) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR7 (Carry Over) 2019-03-29 - Report and Resolution Adopted.