HI SR71 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR71
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Convene A Study Group To Make Recommendations To The Legislature On An Appropriate Means To Honor Robert William Kalanihiapo Wilcox, Hawaii's First Elected Delegate To The United States Congress.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Convene A Study Group To Make Recommendations To The Legislature On An Appropriate Means To Honor Robert William Kalanihiapo Wilcox, Hawaii's First Elected Delegate To The United States Congress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/IAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/IAA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/IAA. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR71 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.