HI SR72 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR72
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Taxation To Conduct A Study To Determine The Amount Of Transient Accommodations Tax Revenues That Would Be Allocated To Each County If The Allocation Were To Be Recalculated Based Upon Population Growth From 2010 To 2017.
Title
Urging The Department Of Taxation To Conduct A Study To Determine The Amount Of Transient Accommodations Tax Revenues That Would Be Allocated To Each County If The Allocation Were To Be Recalculated Based Upon Population Growth From 2010 To 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR72 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Subjects
Allocation
Counties
County Distribution
County Percentage
Department of Taxation
Population Growth
Recalculate
Study
Transient Accommodations Tax
Counties
County Distribution
County Percentage
Department of Taxation
Population Growth
Recalculate
Study
Transient Accommodations Tax
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=72&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR72_.HTM |