HI SR76 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Medical Cannabis Control And Regulation, In Collaboration With The Chairpersons Of The Senate Standing Committee On Health And Human Services And House Of Representatives Standing Committee On Health And Homelessness, To Convene The Medical And Adult Use Cannabis Working Group To Research, Develop, And Finalize Recommendations For The Creation Of A Dual Use Regulatory System Allowing Access To Medical Cannabis And Cannabis For Adult Use.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Medical Cannabis Control And Regulation, In Collaboration With The Chairpersons Of The Senate Standing Committee On Health And Human Services And House Of Representatives Standing Committee On Health And Homelessness, To Convene The Medical And Adult Use Cannabis Working Group To Research, Develop, And Finalize Recommendations For The Creation Of A Dual Use Regulatory System Allowing Access To Medical Cannabis And Cannabis For Adult Use.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-23 10:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR85 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28