HI SR8 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Support The Efforts Of The National Women's History Museum To Secure A Permanent Home In The Nation's Capital.
Title
National Women's History Museum; Congressional Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) One Day Notice 04-04-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Reported from HMS/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3153) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-12 1:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) Referred to HMS/PGM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR8 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - (S) Recommitted to HMS/PGM.
HR12 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - (H) Referred to CUA, referral sheet 9
HCR18 (Same As) 2012-04-02 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
HR12 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - (H) Referred to CUA, referral sheet 9
HCR18 (Same As) 2012-04-02 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.