HI SR8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR8
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR8 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to ETT, PSM/JDL.
HR14 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen excused (4).
HR14 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=8&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR8_.HTM |