HI SR8 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR8
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Examine The Implementation Of Act 217, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2018, Regarding Misrepresentation Of Service Animals.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Examine The Implementation Of Act 217, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2018, Regarding Misrepresentation Of Service Animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR8 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).