HI SR94 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Hilo To Establish A Formal Association With The Rise 21st Century After School Program.
Title
UH Hilo; R.I.S.E. Program
Sponsors
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=94&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR94_.HTM |