HI SR94 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Demanding The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Develop A Comprehensive Recycling Program, With Specific Focus On The Collection Of Hi-5 Recyclable Items, To Be Implemented In All Offices At The Hawaii State Capitol.
Title
Demanding The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Develop A Comprehensive Recycling Program, With Specific Focus On The Collection Of Hi-5 Recyclable Items, To Be Implemented In All Offices At The Hawaii State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from GVO/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3614) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to GVO/AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR112 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27