HI SR96 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Display A Portrait Of Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole In Each State Building, Office, Meeting Room, And Waiting Area Under The Department's Jurisdiction.
Title
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Display A Portrait Of Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole In Each State Building, Office, Meeting Room, And Waiting Area Under The Department's Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-24. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3409) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR107 (Same As) 2024-03-13 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 21
SCR114 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 26
SCR114 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 26