HI SR98 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR98
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The New York Declaration On Forests To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement And The 2030 Agenda For Sustainable Development; Specifically Sustainable Development Goal 15, Life On Land.
Title
Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The New York Declaration On Forests To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement And The 2030 Agenda For Sustainable Development; Specifically Sustainable Development Goal 15, Life On Land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1792) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR98 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR60 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR60 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development
Climate Change
New York Declaration on Forests
Sustainable Development Goals
United Nations
Climate Change
New York Declaration on Forests
Sustainable Development Goals
United Nations
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=98&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR98_.HTM |