IA HF2037 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to damages assessed for engaging in prohibited actions involving eagles, and making penalties applicable. (See HF 2173.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to damages assessed for engaging in prohibited actions involving eagles, and making penalties applicable. (See HF 2173.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Baxter, Kerr and Thede. H.J. 129. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 114. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2173 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 593.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2037 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2037.html |