IA HF2105 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act excluding nonqualified deferred compensation income from the individual income tax, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2638.)
Title
A bill for an act excluding nonqualified deferred compensation income from the individual income tax, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2638.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 681. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2638. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 452. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Bloomingdale and Wilson. H.J. 170. |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 118. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2638 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 727.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2105 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2105.html |