IA HF2527 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2569.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the state, including city and county zoning, work-based learning, recruitment of health care professionals, regulations affecting veterans and military spouses, insurance producer temporary licenses, and the state building code, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 682; See HF 2569.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the state, including city and county zoning, work-based learning, recruitment of health care professionals, regulations affecting veterans and military spouses, insurance producer temporary licenses, and the state building code, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 682; See HF 2569.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2569. |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 627. |
2022-03-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2022-03-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/21/2022 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-03-14 | House | Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2022 12:30PM RM 304.1. |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Nordman, Isenhart and Siegrist. H.J. 439. |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee: Graber, Isenhart and Nordman. H.J. 439. |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 393. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3123 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361.
HSB682 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2527.
SF2361 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2383. S.J. 692.
HF2569 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 861.
SF2383 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.
HSB682 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2527.
SF2361 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2383. S.J. 692.
HF2569 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 861.
SF2383 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2527 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2527.html |