IA HF2542 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to education data collection and the determination of enrollment, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 672.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to education data collection and the determination of enrollment, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 672.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8120 filed. H.J. 498. |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 278. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3156 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
HSB672 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2542.
SF2367 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
HSB672 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2542.
SF2367 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2542 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2542.html |