IA HF440 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 627.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 627.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the crime of the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, including the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device committed against a person under eighteen years of age, and providing penalties.(See HF 627.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the crime of the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, including the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device committed against a person under eighteen years of age, and providing penalties.(See HF 627.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 627. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 489. |
2023-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Henderson and Meyer, B. H.J. 444. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 424. |
Same As/Similar To
SF222 (Similar To) 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 276.
HF627 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1030.
HF627 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1030.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF440 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF440.html |