IA HF5 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to abortions including prohibiting late-term abortions with certain exceptions, providing penalties, and including an effective date provision. (See Cmte. Bill HF 657)
Title
A bill for an act relating to abortions including prohibiting late-term abortions with certain exceptions, providing penalties, and including an effective date provision. (See Cmte. Bill HF 657)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-31 | Withdrawn. H.J. 867. | |
2011-03-09 | Subcommittee, Hagenow, Baltimore, and Petersen. H.J. 643. | |
2011-02-22 | Rereferred to Government Oversight. H.J. 386. | |
2011-01-12 | Subcommittee, Anderson, Brandenburg, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 78. | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 56. |