IA HF562 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Subcommittee: Chelgren, Dvorsky, and C. Johnson. S.J. 814.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Subcommittee: Chelgren, Dvorsky, and C. Johnson. S.J. 814.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to provide that peace officers and retired peace officers qualify as classroom driver education instructors. (Formerly HF 419.)
Title
A bill for an act to provide that peace officers and retired peace officers qualify as classroom driver education instructors. (Formerly HF 419.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Dvorsky, and C. Johnson. S.J. 814. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 778. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 778. |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2017-03-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 803. |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 59, nays 39. H.J. 781. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1217 adopted. H.J. 781. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1216 adopted. H.J. 780. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1229 to H-1216 lost. H.J. 780. |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1229 filed. H.J. 759. |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendments H-1216 and H-1217 filed. H.J. 695. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 555. |
Same As/Similar To
SF229 (Similar To) 2017-02-13 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Bowman, and Greene. S.J. 272.
HF419 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 786.
HF419 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 786.