IA HF585 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to regional representation and residency requirements for members of the state transportation commission, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 231.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to regional representation and residency requirements for members of the state transportation commission, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 231.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2023 9:00AM Senate Lounge. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Bennett, and Bousselot. S.J. 679. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 650. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 650. |
2023-03-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 706. |
2023-03-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 726. |
2023-03-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 699. |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 482. |
Same As/Similar To
SF11 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Bennett, and Brown. S.J. 158.
HF231 (Similar To) 2023-03-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 706.
HF231 (Similar To) 2023-03-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 706.