IA HF675 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 894.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 894.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning mechanics' liens including the establishment of a state construction registry for residential construction property, and including effective date and applicability provisions. Effective 1-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act concerning mechanics' liens including the establishment of a state construction registry for residential construction property, and including effective date and applicability provisions. Effective 1-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 894. | |
2012-04-24 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 878. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 878. | |
2012-04-17 | Message from House. S.J. 813. | |
2012-04-17 | Immediate message. H.J. 828. | |
2012-04-17 | Passed House, ayes 75, nays 24. H.J. 825. | |
2012-04-17 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-04-17 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8457. H.J. 824. | |
2012-04-16 | Senate amendment H-8457 filed. H.J. 818. | |
2012-04-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 816. | |
2012-04-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 801. | |
2012-04-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 2. S.J. 800. | |
2012-04-16 | Amendment S-5195, as amended, adopted. S.J. 800. | |
2012-04-16 | Amendment S-5212 filed, adopted. S.J. 800. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5195 filed. S.J. 762. | |
2012-04-10 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 762. | |
2012-03-01 | Subcommittee reassigned, Hogg, Chelgren, and Mathis. S.J. 425. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-18 | Subcommittee, Hogg, Chelgren, and Dandekar. S.J. 1011. | |
2011-04-13 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 986. | |
2011-04-13 | Message from House. S.J. 986. | |
2011-04-13 | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed House, ayes 68, nays 29. H.J. 1032. | |
2011-04-13 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment H-1637 adopted. H.J. 1031. | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment H-1637 filed. H.J. 999. | |
2011-04-07 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 958. |