IA HF692 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of state and local elections, providing penalties, and including effective date elections provisions. (Formerly HF 608.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division II, effective 5-16-19 and Division IV, effective 1-1-23.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of state and local elections, providing penalties, and including effective date elections provisions. (Formerly HF 608.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division II, effective 5-16-19 and Division IV, effective 1-1-23.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1037. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1134. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1134. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3231. S.J. 1133. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3231 to H-1244. S.J. 1132. |
2019-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 1021. |
2019-04-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1244, as amended. H.J. 1020. |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment H-1308 to Senate amendment H-1244 filed, adopted. H.J. 1020. |
2019-04-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-18 | House | Senate amendment H-1244 filed. H.J. 926. |
2019-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 902. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1006. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 18. S.J. 1005. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3119 adopted, as amended. S.J. 1005. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3172 to S-3119 filed, adopted. S.J. 1005. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3181 to S-3119 filed, lost. S.J. 1004. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3179 to S-3119 filed, lost. S.J. 1003. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3178 to S-3119 filed, lost. S.J. 1003. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3177 to S-3119 filed, lost. S.J. 1002. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3119 filed. S.J. 863. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 863. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Chapman, and Jochum. S.J. 710. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 695. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 641. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 641. |
2019-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 561. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 561. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 480. |
Same As/Similar To
HF608 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.