IA SF119 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to standards for carbon monoxide protection and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to standards for carbon monoxide protection and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Shipley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 453. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 3:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 196. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 174. |