IA SF143 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 483.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 483.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project for child welfare legal representation.(Formerly SSB 1015.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project for child welfare legal representation.(Formerly SSB 1015.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 483. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | HF 113 substituted. S.J. 482. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Attached to HF 113. S.J. 245. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 198. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 191. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1015 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 143.
HSB18 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 180.
HF113 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 731.
HSB18 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 180.
HF113 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 731.