IA SF2261 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to operating-while-intoxicated offenses, including temporary restricted licenses and ignition interlock devices, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3015.) Effective date: 01/01/2025. Applicability date: 01/01/2025.
Title
A bill for an act relating to operating-while-intoxicated offenses, including temporary restricted licenses and ignition interlock devices, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3015.) Effective date: 01/01/2025. Applicability date: 01/01/2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 953. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 896. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 744. |
2024-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 730. |
2024-04-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 738. |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 87, nays 7. H.J. 722. |
2024-04-03 | House | Substituted for HF 2423. H.J. 721. |
2024-04-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 703. |
2024-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 703. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 682. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 39, nays 8. S.J. 679. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5108 filed, adopted. S.J. 679. |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 257. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3015 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261.
HSB618 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2423.
HF2423 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 730.
HSB618 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2423.
HF2423 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 730.