IA SF229 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to elections or appointments to a county magistrate appointing commission. (Formerly SSB 1098.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to elections or appointments to a county magistrate appointing commission. (Formerly SSB 1098.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-10 | Subcommittee, R. Olson, Kaufmann, and Palmer. H.J. 757. | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 709. | |
2009-03-06 | Message from Senate. H.J. 702. | |
2009-03-05 | Immediate message. S.J. 535. | |
2009-03-05 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 530. | |
2009-02-24 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 397. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 392. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0255B&ga=83 |