IA SF458 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 862.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 862.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to debts for which the homestead is liable by providing that the homestead may be sold to satisfy debts secured by a mechanic's lien, including principal, interest, attorney fees, and costs, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1147.) Effective date: 06/25/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to debts for which the homestead is liable by providing that the homestead may be sold to satisfy debts secured by a mechanic's lien, including principal, interest, attorney fees, and costs, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1147.) Effective date: 06/25/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 756. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 826. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 861. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 824. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5065. S.J. 824. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5065. S.J. 523. |
2020-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 461. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 456. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment H-1134 adopted, as amended. H.J. 455. |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment H-1182, to committee amendment H-1134 adopted. H.J. 455. |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 210. |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 210. |
2020-01-21 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Konfrst and Mitchell. H.J. 80. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1182 filed. H.J. 797. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee amendment H-1134 filed. H.J. 760. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 759. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-28 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Konfrst and Mitchell. H.J. 690. |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 674. |
2019-03-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 673. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 35, nays 13. S.J. 766. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 766. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 456. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 449. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1147 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB174 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB174 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.