IA SSB1193 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF521
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to assaults on sports officials, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 521.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to assaults on sports officials, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 521.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 521. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 11:00AM Room G15. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Evans. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF521 (Replaced by) 2024-02-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 288.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1193 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1193.html |