IA SSB3097 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2109
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2463
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2463
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2109.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2109.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2109.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2109.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2109. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Dotzler, and Driscoll. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Workforce. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WORKFORCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB612 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
SF2109 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
HF2463 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
SF2109 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
HF2463 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3097 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3097.html |