ID S1265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AUDITS OF LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the minimum requirements for an audit.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the minimum requirements for an audit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2024-02-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | to House |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |