IL HB0001 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Prohibits (i) labor organizations that represent public employees of the State and (ii) political action committees affiliated with those labor organizations from making campaign contributions to political committees established to promote the candidacy of a declared candidate for statewide office or a statewide officeholder. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-UNION CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2010-12-28 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0001.htm |