IL HB0061 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Makes changes to the provision concerning children of school age who are reported as having been diagnosed as having AIDS or HIV. Provides that the information contained in the notification to be required of the Department of Public Health with regard to a child enrolled in a public school in kindergarten through fifth grade who is diagnosed as being infected with HIV must not be recorded in the child's permanent record. Provides that if the information is in the child's permanent school record, the information must be purged from the child's record before the child enters the sixth grade. Provides that if the child is enrolled in a public school, the principal shall disclose (instead of disclose the identity of the child) to the superintendent of the school district in which the child resides and specifies that the disclosure shall be that a child has been infected with HIV. Provides that all provisions of the AIDS Confidentiality Act shall apply, including penalties for violation of that Act.
Title
COMMUNICABLE DISEASE-DISCLOSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0353 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-013-000 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-002-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-055-001 |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-02-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-002-000 |
2013-02-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-03 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 315 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |