IL HB0073 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that, beginning in State fiscal year 2015, contributions required for the basic program of group health benefits shall be calculated using a sliding scale that takes into account the following variables: (i) length of service, (ii) ability to pay, (iii) pension income, (iv) Medicare eligibility, and (v) whether an individual has made an election under a specific provision of the Illinois Pension Code. Prohibits these contributions from being less than the contributions paid for these benefits in State fiscal year 2014. Also makes technical changes. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
STATE HEALTHCARE CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |