IL HB0078 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that if a school board designates the area within 1,000 feet of a school to be a safe school zone, then the principal of that school and the local law enforcement agency may prohibit persons, other than residents, from entering the safe school zone without a legitimate purpose (as jointly defined by the school board and the local law enforcement agency). Creates the offense of criminal trespass to school land, a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
SAFE SCHOOL ZONE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0547 |
2011-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2011-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2011-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Frerichs |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Frerichs |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 010-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-06 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2011-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-000-003 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-04 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 21-5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |