IL HB0238 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act, MC/DD Act, ID/DD Community Care Act, and Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. Provides that a facility must not enter into a pre-dispute agreement for binding arbitration with any resident or consumer, or the resident's representative or consumer's guardian, nor require that a resident or consumer sign an arbitration agreement as a condition of admission to the facility. Provides that after a dispute arises, a facility may ask a resident or consumer, or his or her representative or guardian, to enter into an agreement for binding arbitration if the facility and agreement meets specified requirements.
Title
LONG TERM CARE-ARBITRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-06-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2017-06-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-06-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-06-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-06-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-06-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-05-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-31 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-021-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 069-040-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-08 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-005 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 2-202.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 46 | 2-202.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 47 | 2-202.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 49 | 3-101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |