IL HB0240 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Facilities Closure Act. Creates the Correctional Facilities Panel. Provides that the Panel shall perform a detailed examination of the State's correctional facilities and the respective populations and workforces of the facilities. Sets forth the membership of the panel. Provides that no correctional facility managed or operated by the Illinois Department of Corrections may be closed, eliminated, or otherwise required to reduce its 2008 average daily population or average daily workforce by more than 20% prior to the completion of the submission of the final report by the Correctional Facilities Panel. Effective immediately.
Title
CORRECTIONAL FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-20 | First Reading | |
2009-01-16 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=240&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0240.htm |