IL HB0240 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that is not a violation of the cruel treatment provision of the Humane Care for Animals Act to trap, neuter or spay, vaccinate, and release or return an animal to the animal's original habitat by a caretaker to reduce the number of stray animals. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMANE CARE ANIMAL-CRUEL EXCEP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=240&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0240.htm |