IL HB0255 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that, notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, the Teachers Health Insurance Security Fund is not subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from the Teachers Health Insurance Security Fund into any other fund of the State. Effective immediately
Title
STATE EMPLOY GROUP INS-TEACHER
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Roth [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Rosemary Mulligan [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
2011-03-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 6.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=255&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0255.htm |