IL HB0255 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Rent Control Preemption Act.
Title
RENT CONTROL PREEMPTION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-11 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-12-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-08 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 825 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=255&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0255.htm |