IL HB0257 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the Chicago Board of Education for the 2023 and 2027 consolidated primary elections. Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that no later than June 30, 2029, the General Assembly must review and revise the election of members of the Chicago Board of Education and if the General Assembly has not reauthorized the election of members of the Chicago Board of Education by June 30, 2029, then, on May 13, 2031, the terms of all members elected in 2027 shall end, and a new Chicago Board of Education consisting of 7 members shall be appointed by the Mayor. Makes conforming changes. Provides that, beginning on May 9, 2023 and until May 13, 2031, successors of the Inspector General for the Chicago school district shall be appointed by the school board instead of the Mayor. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTED CHICAGO SCHOOL BOARD
Sponsors
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 2A-48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-21.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=257&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0257.htm |