IL HB0264 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Urban Development Authority Act. Creates the Illinois Urban Development Authority. Provides that the Authority shall be governed by an 11-member board. Requires the Authority to make annual reports to certain entities. Sets forth the duties and powers of the Authority. Sets forth the procedures by which the Authority may issue bonds to specified entities. Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Provides that the Illinois Finance Authority shall supervise the bond issuance of the Illinois Urban Development Authority. Contains other provisions.
Title
URBAN DEVELOPMENT AUTH ACT
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. David Miller [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0234 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rickey R. Hendon | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Commerce; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Commerce | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-03-24 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-02-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate International Trade & Commerce Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller |