IL HB0265 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who is subject to an order of protection, an emergency order of protection, or an interim 30-day order of protection may not purchase or transport any firearm while the order is in effect. Provides that a person who is the subject of an emergency order of protection may not transport or possess a firearm while in the residence of the alleged victim while the order is in effect. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM-PROTECT ORDER
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris [D] |
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-02-19 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=265&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0265.htm |