IL HB0307 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Citizens Empowerment Act. Provides that electors may petition for a referendum at the next general election to dissolve a unit of local government. Sets forth the requirements for the petition, together with the form and requirements for the ballot referendum. Provides for the transfer of all real and personal property and any other assets, together with all personnel, contractual obligations, and liabilities of the dissolving unit of local government to the receiving unit of local government. Amends the Election Code to provide exceptions for the Citizens Empowerment Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CITIZENS EMPOWERMENT ACT
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 28-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=307&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0307.htm |