IL HB0310 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that each appropriation for a legislative member initiative must be by a separate line item appropriation that fully describes the legislative member initiative. Provides that no legislative member initiative may be funded through a lump sum appropriation. Provides that an appropriation for a legislative member initiative or a capital improvement is released and available for expenditure as a matter of law; and authorizes enforcement by mandamus maintained by any member of the General Assembly. Defines "legislative member initiative" and "capital improvement".
Title
MEMBER INITIATIVE-CAPITAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-04-22 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-04-03 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |