IL HB0333 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the maximum reduction for the senior homestead exemption is $9,000 in counties with a population of more than 500,000 but not more than 1,000,000, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, and $5,000 in all other counties. Provides that the corporate authorities of the City of Chicago or the county board of a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants may, by ordinance, increase the maximum reduction for the senior homestead exemption for property under the jurisdiction of that city or county to not more than $9,000. Provides that the maximum reduction for the general homestead exemption is $12,000 in counties with a population of more than 500,000 but not more than 1,000,000, $10,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, and $6,000 in all other counties. Provides that the corporate authorities of the City of Chicago or the county board of a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants may, by ordinance, increase the maximum reduction for the general homestead exemption for property under the jurisdiction of that city or county to not more than $12,000.
Title
PROPERTY TAX-HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=333&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0333.htm |