IL HB0358 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0653 |
2012-01-13 | House | Effective Date January 13, 2012 |
2012-01-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-12-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-11-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-004-000 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 10, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 9, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-001 |
2011-11-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-10-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-040-000 |
2011-10-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2011-10-27 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-10-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-10-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-003-000 |
2011-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-10-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-10-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |