IL HB0400 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Carnival and Amusement Rides Safety Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Changes the definition of "volunteer" to mean "any person who operates or assists in the operation of an amusement ride or amusement attraction, or performs any other function related to a carnival or fair, for an owner or operator without pay or lodging". Provides that no person, firm, corporation, or other entity that owns or operates a carnival or fair shall employ any individual, or permit any individual to volunteer, who (i) has been convicted of any offense set forth in Article 11 of the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012, (ii) is a registered sex offender, as defined in the Sex Offender Registration Act, or (iii) has ever been convicted of any offense set forth in Article 9 of the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person, firm, corporation, or other entity that owns or operates a carnival or fair must conduct a criminal history records check and perform a check of the National Sex Offender Public Registry for all employees and volunteers, regardless of their job function, at the time they are hired or begin volunteering, and annually thereafter except if they are in the continued employ of the entity. Provides that a carnival or fair owner is not responsible for any personal information submitted by an employee or volunteer for criminal history records checks. Provides that any person, firm, corporation, or other entity that owns or operates a carnival or fair that violates the provisions of subsection (a) of this Section or fails to conduct a criminal history records check or a sex offender registry check for its employees or volunteers shall be assessed a civil penalty in an amount not to exceed $10,000 for a first offense, not to exceed $25,000 for a second offense, and not to exceed $50,000 for a third or subsequent offense. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for a child sex offender to knowingly operate, manage, be employed by, or be associated with any amusement enterprise, carnival, or fair, including a county fair, when persons under the age of 18 are present. Effective immediately.
Title
AMUSEMENT RIDE SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-26 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2015-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2015-02-19 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 85 | 2-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 85 | 2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 85 | 2-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 85 | 2-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=400&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0400.htm |